U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.