U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huerta-Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.