U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.