U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montes-Barahona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Strike]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.