U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Busch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Strike]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.