U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Machara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.