U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Release Order]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.