U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.