U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.