U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.