U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pedersen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 03, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.