U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Venstra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Reassign Case]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.