U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moroyoqui
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • September 23, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.