U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murillo-Rodas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 05, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.