U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ballesteros-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.