U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00393-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Faleola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Petition and Order]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.