U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00467
  • Case Name: Capana Swiss Advisors AG et al v. Rymark Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Expedite]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • December 02, 2024: [Extension of Time]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Seal]
  • November 14, 2024: [Protective Order]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Short Term Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.