U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss Case for Speedy Trial Violations]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.