U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00169-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerra et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.