U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Crossett v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 28, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.