U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.