U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00967
  • Case Name: Dunn v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 25, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.