U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10118
  • Case Name: Joseph L. Daigle and Lisa M. Daigle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Trustee Fees]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Final Decree]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order of Discharge]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [1-Discharging Debtor]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Form 423 - Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [341 Mtg Continued]
March, 2018
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.