U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dwyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 26, 2021: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 05, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: [Attorney Substitution]
  • March 03, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Return of Service Executed (non-summons)]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 27, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 04, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • November 25, 2019: [Issuance of a Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2019: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 23, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.