U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Memorandum re: Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 18, 2020: [Memorandum re: Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 17, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 28, 2020: [Memorandum re: Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Probation Form 12]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2019: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 27, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • April 17, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 15, 2019: [Unseal Document (Court use only)]
  • April 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.