U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cowles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 15, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • January 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 13, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extension of Time]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 25, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.