U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Callahan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Document Unsealed]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • October 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • February 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2021: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.