U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Bunce et al v. Glock, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Compel]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Discovery Certificate - Interrogatories and Request to Produce]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.