U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valentin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Refer Defendant to Recovery Court]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Refer to Recovery Court]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.