U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barsalou
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.