U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Capellan-Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 30, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2025: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.