U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patin-Patin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.