U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Brochu v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent to Direct Assignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Consent to Direct Assignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Consent to Direct Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.