open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:19-cv-00023
    Party Name:Kish v. Carilion Clinic et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief / Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Letter]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113925
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =