U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 06, 2022: [Letter/Request]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to Amendment 782]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Respond - First Step Act]
  • May 12, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 28, 2022: [Seal]
  • February 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 03, 2021: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Minute Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Standing Order 2019-1 - Sec 404 First Step Act of 2018 - Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2021: [First Step Act - Compassionate Release]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Transferring Case to Another Judge]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • June 18, 2019: [Addendum to PSI - First Step Act of 2018]
  • June 10, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • June 06, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.