U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:99-cr-70013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tahlib
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
  • December 10, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 10, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [USCA Appeal Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • November 06, 2019: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel in 4CCA]
  • November 06, 2019: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • November 01, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • November 01, 2019: [SEALED PSR - Final]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Appeal/Revocation Dft to 4CCA]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment-Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • October 22, 2019: [Supervised Release Violation Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Brief /Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • July 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 - Revocation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 13, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.