open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia
    Case Number:7:19-cv-00615
    Party Name:Cephas v. Buckingham Correctional Center
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Fee]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Evidence]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Prisoner Condfil]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Assets]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116511
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =