U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order of Destruction]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order to Respond]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 03, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.