U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v Washburn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 22, 2022: [Transcript Request]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order for Release of Funds]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Transcript Copy Delivered]
  • December 20, 2021: [Transcript Request]
  • December 19, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 19, 2021: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • December 17, 2021: [Transcript Request]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED PSR - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 21, 2021: [Response]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • July 13, 2021: [Dillon Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • July 09, 2021: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • July 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2021: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 09, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [In Limine]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2020: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2020: [Discovery]
  • November 19, 2020: [Disclosure]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • November 17, 2020: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • November 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2020: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.