U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-po-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss (Petty Offense)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Dismiss (Petty Offense)]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket Call]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Court Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Court Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [In Person Appearance Rights]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2021: [Violation Notice Issued or PO Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.