U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ayers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Veterans Treatment Court - Referral Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.