U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reece
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Instructions to the Defendant]
  • August 25, 2022: [Instructions to the Garnishee]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice by Clerk of Post Judgment Garnishment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.