U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phanelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Appeal Transcript Filed]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 11, 2024: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
January, 2023
  • January 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • September 07, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 02, 2022: [Disclosure]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2022: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • August 30, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.