U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notification of Transcript Fees]
  • April 30, 2025: [SEALED PSR - Final Amended]
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 25, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 21, 2025: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 09, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 04, 2025: [Letter/Request]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
December, 2024
  • December 14, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.