U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00799
  • Case Name: Nealson v. Intel Officer C. Cole et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.