U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Western Express, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Attorney - Updating Contact Information]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.