U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Peyton v. Blue Ridge Radiology, P.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 24, 2025: [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.