U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Brake v. Liberty University, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.