U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Thacker v. Virginia Dep't of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: [Letter/Request]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Service (1983 OAG)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service - (1983 OAG)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Granting IFP (to be used in Prisoner cases ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.