U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00066
  • Case Name: McNair v. United States Of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.